NJ A5890 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.165.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.165.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns enforcement of employee misclassification and stop-work order laws.
Title
Concerns enforcement of employee misclassification and stop-work order laws.
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3920 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3920 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-08 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.165. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (26-9) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Substituted for S3920 (1R) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (48-22-2) |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3920 (Same As) 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A5890 (1R)