NJ A5863 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S3990 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S3990 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes child care revitalization fund in Department of Community Affairs; appropriates $100,000,000.
Title
Establishes child care revitalization fund in Department of Community Affairs; appropriates $100,000,000.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted by S3990 (2R) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3990 (Same As) 2021-07-01 - Approved P.L.2021, c.144.