NJ A5817 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.511.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.511.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows certain persons to qualify for casino key employee license and casino employee registration.
Title
Allows certain persons to qualify for casino key employee license and casino employee registration.
Sponsors
Rep. Vincent Mazzeo [D] | Rep. John Armato [D] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] |
Sen. Chris Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4263 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-07 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-07 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.511. |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-1) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Substituted for S4263 |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (64-8-1) |
2019-11-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-14 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4263 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Substituted by A5817 (1R)