NJ A5690 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Approved P.L.2021, c.244.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Approved P.L.2021, c.244.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOLWD to provide link to New Jersey Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program on website and in emails concerning unemployment compensation benefits.
Title
Requires DOLWD to provide link to New Jersey Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program on website and in emails concerning unemployment compensation benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3772 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3772 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-30 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.244. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Substituted for S3772 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3772 (Same As) 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A5690