NJ S3772 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A5690
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A5690
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOLWD to provide link to New Jersey Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program on website and in emails concerning unemployment compensation benefits.
Title
Requires DOLWD to provide link to New Jersey Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program on website and in emails concerning unemployment compensation benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Substituted by A5690 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5690 (Same As) 2021-09-30 - Approved P.L.2021, c.244.