NJ A5651 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-06 - Approved P.L.2023, c.99.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-06 - Approved P.L.2023, c.99.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns qualified offshore wind projects and federal tax benefits for certain offshore wind investments.
Title
Concerns qualified offshore wind projects and federal tax benefits for certain offshore wind investments.
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] | Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] |
Sen. Robert Smith [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4019 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 42 N: 32 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4019 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 42 N: 32 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-06 | Senate | Approved P.L.2023, c.99. |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (21-14) |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Substituted for S4019 (1R) |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (46-30-0) |
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Motion To Table Aa (42-32-0) (Greenwald) |
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Motion To Aa (Simonsen) |
2023-06-28 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-06-28 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Budget Committee |
2023-06-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-06-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4019 (Same As) 2023-06-30 - Substituted by A5651 (2R)