VT H0871 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the development of an updated State aid to school construction program
Title
An act relating to the development of an updated State aid to school construction program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Education |
2024-04-02 | House | Read third time and passed |
2024-04-02 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2024-03-29 | House | Rep. Conlon of Cornwall moved to postpone action until 4/02/2024, which was agreed to |
2024-03-29 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2024-03-28 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2024-03-28 | House | Rep. Sims of Craftsbury, Beck of St. Johnsbury, and Small of Winooski moved to amend the bill, which was agreed to |
2024-03-28 | House | Report of Committee on Appropriations agreed to |
2024-03-28 | House | Rep. Mihaly of Calais recommended for the Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-28 | House | Rep. Beck of St. Johnsbury recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-03-28 | House | Rep. Conlon of Cornwall spoke for the Committee on Education |
2024-03-28 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-28 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-03-27 | House | Rep. Conlon of Cornwall moved to postpone action until 03/28/2024, which was agreed to |
2024-03-27 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-03-26 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2024-03-20 | House | Pending entry on Notice Calendar, referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2024-03-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2024-03-15 | House | Committee bill read first time |