LA HB165 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-19 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-19 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to marijuana paraphernalia (EN DECREASE LF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to marijuana paraphernalia (EN DECREASE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-29 - House - House Vote on HB 165 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1527) (Y: 68 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - House - House Vote on HB 165 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1527) (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 165 FINAL PASSAGE (#1023) (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 165 FINAL PASSAGE (#994) (Y: 14 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-04-10 - House - House Vote on HB 165 FINAL PASSAGE (#386) (Y: 84 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - House - House Vote on HB 165 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1527) (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 165 FINAL PASSAGE (#1023) (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 165 FINAL PASSAGE (#994) (Y: 14 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-04-10 - House - House Vote on HB 165 FINAL PASSAGE (#386) (Y: 84 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-19 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2024. |
2024-06-19 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 682. |
2024-06-03 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-05-30 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-29 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 68, nays 26, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2024-05-22 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/29/2024. |
2024-05-21 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 24 yeas and 14 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Reconsidered. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 14 yeas and 23 nays. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-10 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 11. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-09 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/10/2024. |
2024-04-08 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-02-26 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-02-26 | House | Prefiled. |