NJ A5446 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-8)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Approved P.L.2021, c.46.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Makes $15 million in federal funds available to EDA to support businesses and nonprofits in need.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes $15 million in federal funds available to EDA to support businesses and nonprofits in need.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3519 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenateApproved P.L.2021, c.46.
2021-03-25SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
2021-03-25SenateSubstituted for S3519 (1R)
2021-03-25SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2021-03-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (71-0-0)
2021-03-17AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2021-03-08AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2021-03-08AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3519 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Substituted by A5446 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback