NJ A5415 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Approved P.L.2023, c.78.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Approved P.L.2023, c.78.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provides down payment assistance for benefit of certain first-time homebuyers; establishes Resilient Home Construction Pilot Program.
Title
Provides down payment assistance for benefit of certain first-time homebuyers; establishes Resilient Home Construction Pilot Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3780 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3780 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Senate | Approved P.L.2023, c.78. |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Substituted for S3780 (1R) |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (56-21-1) |
2023-06-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-06-27 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Budget Committee |
2023-06-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2023-05-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3780 (Same As) 2023-06-30 - Substituted by A5415 (2R)