NJ A5385 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Concerns sale and taxation of container e-liquid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerns sale and taxation of container e-liquid.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 17 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-05-23AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (51-17-6)
2019-05-20AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-05-13AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback