NJ S3877 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Substituted by A5385 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Substituted by A5385 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns sale, taxation, and, forfeiture of container e-liquid.*
Title
Concerns sale, taxation, and, forfeiture of container e-liquid.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Senate | Substituted by A5385 (2R) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment (24-0) (Sarlo) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5385 (Same As) 2019-06-30 - Approved P.L.2019, c.147.