NJ A5374 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs DOE to request waiver of certain student academic assessment requirements from federal government.
Title
Directs DOE to request waiver of certain student academic assessment requirements from federal government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (66-6-0) |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3483 (Same As) 2021-02-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee