NJ A5296 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.466.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.466.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for employment by State of certain persons with disabilities.
Title
Provides for employment by State of certain persons with disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3426 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3426 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.466. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted for S3426 (1R) |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3426 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A5296