NJ S3426 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A5296
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A5296
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for employment by State of certain persons with disabilities.
Title
Provides for employment by State of certain persons with disabilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Kean [R] | Sen. Holly Schepisi [R] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] |
Sen. Michael Testa [R] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-06 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-06 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted by A5296 |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment (32-0) (Kean) |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5296 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.466.