NJ A5111 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Approved P.L.2019, c.214.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Approved P.L.2019, c.214.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Innovation District Designation Program."
Title
Establishes "Innovation District Designation Program."
Sponsors
Rep. James Kennedy [D] | Rep. Patricia Jones [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Sen. Joseph Cryan [D] |
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Rep. Clinton Calabrese [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3590 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-08 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.214. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Substituted for S3590 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3590 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A5111