NJ A509 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3442
Note: Carry Over of previous S1963
Note: Carry Over of previous S1963
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes asset forfeiture reporting and transparency requirements.
Title
Establishes asset forfeiture reporting and transparency requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Webber [R] | Rep. Erik Peterson [R] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Serena DiMaso [R] |
Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | Withdrawn from Consideration |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3442 (Carry Over) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S1963 (1R)
S1963 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.304.
S1963 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.304.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A509 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A1000/509_I1.HTM |