NJ S1963 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.304.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes asset forfeiture reporting and transparency requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes asset forfeiture reporting and transparency requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3442 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.304.
2019-12-16AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0)
2019-12-16AssemblySubstituted for A3442 (1R)
2019-12-12AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-02-07AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-07-30AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
2018-07-01SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2018-06-11SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-05-31SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-05-31SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-22SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3442 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S1963 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback