NJ A5084 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Substituted by S3256
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Substituted by S3256
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reclassifies possession of psilocybin as disorderly persons offense.
Title
Reclassifies possession of psilocybin as disorderly persons offense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-17 | Assembly | Substituted by S3256 |
2020-12-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-30 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3256 (Same As) 2021-02-04 - Approved P.L.2021, c.9.