NJ S3256 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - Approved P.L.2021, c.9.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Reclassifies possession of psilocybin as disorderly persons offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reclassifies possession of psilocybin as disorderly persons offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5084 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 23 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-04AssemblyApproved P.L.2021, c.9.
2020-12-17AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (51-23-5)
2020-12-17AssemblySubstituted for A5084
2020-12-17AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2020-12-17SenatePassed by the Senate (23-15)
2020-12-14SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-12-07SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5084 (Same As) 2020-12-17 - Substituted by S3256

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback