NJ A4947 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Substituted by S3004
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Substituted by S3004
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes retroactive date for provisions of P.L.2018, c.165, which clarifies provisions of "Predatory Towing Prevention Act."
Title
Establishes retroactive date for provisions of P.L.2018, c.165, which clarifies provisions of "Predatory Towing Prevention Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Substituted by S3004 |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3004 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - Approved P.L.2021, c.59.