NJ A4746 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.324.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.324.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that certain provider subsidy payments for child care services be based on enrollment.
Title
Requires that certain provider subsidy payments for child care services be based on enrollment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3947 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3947 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.324. |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0) |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2021-11-08 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Substituted for S3947 (1R) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3947 (Same As) 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A4746 (2R)