NJ S3947 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A4746 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A4746 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that certain provider subsidy payments for child care services be based on enrollment.
Title
Requires that certain provider subsidy payments for child care services be based on enrollment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Substituted by A4746 (2R) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4746 (Same As) 2021-12-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.324.