NJ A4743 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.271.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Creates two categories of driver's licenses and identification cards; allows residents unable to prove lawful presence in US to receive permits, and standard driver's licenses or identification cards; permits MVC to increase certain fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates two categories of driver's licenses and identification cards; allows residents unable to prove lawful presence in US to receive permits, and standard driver's licenses or identification cards; permits MVC to increase certain fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3229 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 47 N: 25 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 30 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-19SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.271.
2019-12-16SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (21-17)
2019-12-16SenateMotion To Table Sa (22-15) (Weinberg)
2019-12-16SenateMotion To Sa (Testa)
2019-12-16SenateSubstituted for S3229 (1R)
2019-12-16SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-12-16AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (42-30-5)
2019-12-16AssemblyMotion To Table (47-25-0) (Greenwald)
2019-12-16AssemblyMotion To Aa (Peterson)
2019-12-12AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-12-09AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-12-03AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3229 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A4743 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback