NJ A4734 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-8)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.55.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-8)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.55.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $1,190,349 from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues to NJ Historic Trust for historic site management grants to certain historic preservation projects and associated administrative expenses.
Title
Appropriates $1,190,349 from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues to NJ Historic Trust for historic site management grants to certain historic preservation projects and associated administrative expenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3151 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.55. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Substituted for S3151 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-1) |
2018-12-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-06 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3151 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Substituted by A4734