NJ S3151 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on October 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Substituted by A4734
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Substituted by A4734
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $1,190,349 from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues to NJ Historic Trust for historic site management grants to certain historic preservation projects and associated administrative expenses.
Title
Appropriates $1,190,349 from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues to NJ Historic Trust for historic site management grants to certain historic preservation projects and associated administrative expenses.
Sponsors
Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. Chris Brown [R] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] |
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Senate | Substituted by A4734 |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4734 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.55.