NJ A4722 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on October 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-25 - Substituted by S3089 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-25 - Substituted by S3089 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits certain school districts to establish State military impact aid reserve account.
Title
Permits certain school districts to establish State military impact aid reserve account.
Sponsors
Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Alex Sauickie [R] | Rep. Brandon Umba [R] | Rep. Kim Eulner [R] |
Rep. Marilyn Piperno [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Substituted by S3089 (1R) |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-10-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3089 (Same As) 2023-07-20 - Approved P.L.2023, c.112.