NJ A4655 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A991
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.459.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.459.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits police presence at polling places and ballot drop boxes; prohibits electioneering within 100 feet of ballot drop box.
Title
Limits police presence at polling places and ballot drop boxes; prohibits electioneering within 100 feet of ballot drop box.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 44 N: 28 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3594 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 25 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 44 N: 28 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3594 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 25 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.459. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (44-29-1) |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (21-16) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted for S3595 (2R) |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Senate Amendment (22-0) (Turner) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Amendment (22-0) (Turner) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (44-25-3) |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2020-10-26 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-22 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-10-19 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee |
2020-09-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4655 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.459.
S2923 (Same As) 2021-02-19 - Senate Amendment (21-0) (Turner)
S3595 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A4655 (ACS/2R)
S2923 (Same As) 2021-02-19 - Senate Amendment (21-0) (Turner)
S3595 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A4655 (ACS/2R)