NJ A4634 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-07 - Substituted by S3026 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies and expands liability protections for food donations and gleaning activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifies and expands liability protections for food donations and gleaning activities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-07AssemblySubstituted by S3026 (2R)
2017-06-05AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2017-02-27AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3026 (Same As) 2018-01-05 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (32-0)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback