NJ S3026 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Enrolled on January 5 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-01-05 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (32-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies and expands liability protections for food donations and gleaning activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifies and expands liability protections for food donations and gleaning activities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4634 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-05SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (32-0)
2017-12-11SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2017-12-07AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (65-0-0)
2017-12-07AssemblySubstituted for A4634 (1R)
2017-06-05AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2017-06-01AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2017-05-25SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2017-03-13SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2017-02-27SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4634 (Same As) 2017-12-07 - Substituted by S3026 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback