NJ A457 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Approved P.L.2016, c.53.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes medical marijuana for qualifying patients with post-traumatic stress disorder.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes medical marijuana for qualifying patients with post-traumatic stress disorder.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-08-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2345 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Regulatory Oversight Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-14SenateApproved P.L.2016, c.53.
2016-08-01SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (28-9)
2016-08-01SenateSubstituted for S2345
2016-06-16SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2016-06-16AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (56-13-7)
2016-06-02AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-06-02AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Regulatory Oversight and Reform and Federal Relations Committee
2016-01-27AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3726 (Carry Over) 2015-05-07 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2345 (Same As) 2016-08-01 - Substituted by A457

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback