NJ A3726 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-07 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes medical marijuana for qualifying patients with post-traumatic stress disorder.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes medical marijuana for qualifying patients with post-traumatic stress disorder.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 13 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 13 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Regulatory Oversight Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-07SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
2015-03-26AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (53-13-7)
2015-03-16AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2015-03-16AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Regulatory Oversight Committee
2014-09-22AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2898 (Same As) 2015-05-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback