NJ S2345 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A3726

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-01 - Substituted by A457
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes medical marijuana for qualifying patients with post-traumatic stress disorder.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes medical marijuana for qualifying patients with post-traumatic stress disorder.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-16 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-01SenateSubstituted by A457
2016-06-16SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-06-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A457 (Same As) 2016-09-14 - Approved P.L.2016, c.53.
A3726 (Carry Over) 2015-05-07 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback