NJ A4528 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Revises certain aspects of the State procurement process and permits auction or reverse auction procedures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises certain aspects of the State procurement process and permits auction or reverse auction procedures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-17SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-09-17SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2020-08-27AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (77-0-0)
2020-08-13AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-08-10AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2838 (Same As) 2020-09-17 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback