NJ S2838 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on August 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-29 - Substituted by A4528 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-29 - Substituted by A4528 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises certain aspects of the State procurement process and permits auction or reverse auction procedures.
Title
Revises certain aspects of the State procurement process and permits auction or reverse auction procedures.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-29 | Senate | Substituted by A4528 (1R) |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4528 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Approved P.L.2021, c.4.