NJ A4485 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Substituted by S2980
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Substituted by S2980
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits certain officials to possess pepper spray in quantity carried by law enforcement officers.
Title
Permits certain officials to possess pepper spray in quantity carried by law enforcement officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted by S2980 |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2013-11-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2980 (Same As) 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.219.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/A4485 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A4500/4485_I1.HTM |