NJ A4346 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on August 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-29 - Substituted by S2848 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-29 - Substituted by S2848 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school bus drivers to submit medical certificate to employer to prove continuing physical fitness and to submit to medical examination that includes certain screenings.*
Title
Requires school bus drivers to submit medical certificate to employer to prove continuing physical fitness and to submit to medical examination that includes certain screenings.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-09-17 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Substituted by S2848 (3R) |
2018-09-27 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2018-09-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2848 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.151.