NJ A4222 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on July 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-05 - Approved P.L.2022, c.63.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on July 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-05 - Approved P.L.2022, c.63.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Expands working hours for minors; updates process for obtaining working papers for minors.
Title
Expands working hours for minors; updates process for obtaining working papers for minors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2796 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2796 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-05 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2022, c.63. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-3-0) |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Substituted for S2796 (1R) |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-4-0) |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2796 (Same As) 2022-06-29 - Substituted by A4222 (1R)