NJ A4214 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-05 - Approved P.L.2022, c.62.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-05 - Approved P.L.2022, c.62.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes NJ Infrastructure Bank to expend certain sums to make loans for transportation infrastructure projects for FY2023; makes appropriation.
Title
Authorizes NJ Infrastructure Bank to expend certain sums to make loans for transportation infrastructure projects for FY2023; makes appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2770 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2770 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-05 | Senate | Approved P.L.2022, c.62. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Substituted for S2770 |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-1-1) |
2022-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2770 (Same As) 2022-06-16 - Substituted by A4214