NJ A4205 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2809
Note: Carry Over of previous A4389
Note: Carry Over of previous A4389
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on May 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits use of tents and other fixtures for outdoor dining on certain property.
Title
Permits use of tents and other fixtures for outdoor dining on certain property.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1685 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S2809 (Carry Over) 2022-06-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A4389 (Carry Over) 2022-06-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S2809 (Carry Over) 2022-06-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A4389 (Carry Over) 2022-06-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A4205 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A4500/4205_I1.HTM |