NJ A4023 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.276.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.276.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies rights of judgment creditor of limited liability company member; makes certain technical corrections to the "Revised Uniform Limited Liability Company Act." *
Title
Modifies rights of judgment creditor of limited liability company member; makes certain technical corrections to the "Revised Uniform Limited Liability Company Act." *
Sponsors
Sen. John Burzichelli [D] | Rep. Scott Rumana [R] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] |
Sen. Steven Oroho [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2556 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2556 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2013, c.276. |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0) |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Substituted for S2556 (1R) |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment (29-0) (Sarlo) |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (80-0-0) |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulatory Oversight and Gaming Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2556 (Same As) 2014-01-13 - Substituted by A4023 (1R)