NJ A3992 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on December 15 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (23-15)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 15 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (23-15)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for streamlined review of certain wind energy generation facility installments on farmland. **
Title
Provides for streamlined review of certain wind energy generation facility installments on farmland. **
Sponsors
Rep. Upendra Chivukula [D] | Sen. Joseph Kyrillos [R] | Rep. Charles Mainor [D] | Rep. Vincent Prieto [D] |
Sen. Robert Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-12-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 29 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 29 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-15 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (23-15) | |
2011-12-15 | Substituted for S2887 (SCS) | |
2011-12-08 | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2011-12-05 | Passed by the Assembly (45-25-5) | |
2011-11-21 | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading | |
2011-05-19 | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee | |
2011-05-09 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2887 (Same As) 2011-12-15 - Substituted by A3992 (ACS)