NJ A3988 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Substituted by S3240 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

"Charlie's Law"; requires pharmacy practice sites and hospice programs to furnish patients with information and products to safely dispose of unused prescription drugs and medications.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Charlie's Law"; requires pharmacy practice sites and hospice programs to furnish patients with information and products to safely dispose of unused prescription drugs and medications.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25AssemblySubstituted by S3240 (2R)
2019-02-07AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2018-05-17AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3014 (Same As) 2018-10-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3240 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback