NJ S3240 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

"Charlie's Law"; requires pharmacy practice sites and hospice programs to furnish patients with information and products to safely dispose of unused prescription drugs and medications.**

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Charlie's Law"; requires pharmacy practice sites and hospice programs to furnish patients with information and products to safely dispose of unused prescription drugs and medications.**

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3988 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13AssemblyConditional Veto, Received in the Senate
2019-03-14SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0)
2019-03-04SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-02-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (75-0-0)
2019-02-25AssemblySubstituted for A3988/5010 (ACS)
2019-02-07AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-02-07AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
2019-01-31SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2019-01-17SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-12-03SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5010 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - Combined with A3988 (ACS)
A3988 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Substituted by S3240 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback