NJ A3975 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - Approved P.L.2022, c.51.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - Approved P.L.2022, c.51.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns protections with respect to nondisclosure of certain patient information relating to reproductive healthcare services, and protecting access to services and procedures related to abortion for certain out-of-State persons.
Title
Concerns protections with respect to nondisclosure of certain patient information relating to reproductive healthcare services, and protecting access to services and procedures related to abortion for certain out-of-State persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2633 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2633 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-01 | Senate | Approved P.L.2022, c.51. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (24-13) |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Substituted for S2633 (1R) |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (49-16-13) |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2633 (Same As) 2022-06-29 - Substituted by A3975 (ACS)