NJ A3969 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-05 - Approved P.L.2015, c.19.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-05 - Approved P.L.2015, c.19.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
"Hackensack Meadowlands Agency Consolidation Act"; "Hackensack Meadowlands Transportation Planning District Act of 2014"; "New Jersey Meadowlands Tax Relief Act."
Title
"Hackensack Meadowlands Agency Consolidation Act"; "Hackensack Meadowlands Transportation Planning District Act of 2014"; "New Jersey Meadowlands Tax Relief Act."
Sponsors
Rep. Vincent Prieto [D] | Rep. Gary Schaer [D] | Rep. Marlene Caride [D] | Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] |
Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2647 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-22 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2647 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 62 N: 4 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 25 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 25 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 62 N: 4 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-22 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2647 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 62 N: 4 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 25 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 25 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 62 N: 4 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | Senate | Approved P.L.2015, c.19. |
2014-12-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (21-12) |
2014-12-22 | Senate | Substituted for S2647 (2R) |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-18 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (42-25-1) |
2014-12-18 | Assembly | Emergency Resolution (Prieto) (62-4-0) |
2014-12-18 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Prieto) |
2014-12-15 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Schaer) |
2014-12-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2647 (Same As) 2014-12-22 - Substituted by A3969 (3R)
S2467 (Same As) 2016-01-07 - Substituted by A3850 (5R)
S2467 (Same As) 2016-01-07 - Substituted by A3850 (5R)