NJ A3917 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1597
Note: Carry Over of previous S3167
Note: Carry Over of previous S3167
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enters New Jersey in multistate Nurse Licensure Compact.
Title
Enters New Jersey in multistate Nurse Licensure Compact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2017-12-07 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (69-0-0) |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3917 (Carry Over) 2017-12-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S103 (Same As) 2017-06-01 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3167 (Carry Over) 2015-10-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S103 (Same As) 2017-06-01 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3167 (Carry Over) 2015-10-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee