NJ A1597 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A3917

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S954/1699 (SCS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enters New Jersey in enhanced multistate Nurse Licensure Compact. *

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enters New Jersey in enhanced multistate Nurse Licensure Compact. *

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23AssemblySubstituted by S954/1699 (SCS/1R)
2019-05-20AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-01-17AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-01-17AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
2018-02-08AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3917 (Carry Over) 2017-12-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S954 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback