NJ S103 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3167

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-01 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enters New Jersey in multistate Nurse Licensure Compact.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enters New Jersey in multistate Nurse Licensure Compact.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-01SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2017-06-01SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-01-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3167 (Carry Over) 2015-10-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3917 (Same As) 2017-12-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback