NJ A389 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2424
Note: Carry Foward to future S1692
Note: Carry Over of previous A1018
Note: Carry Foward to future S1692
Note: Carry Over of previous A1018
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health insurance coverage for certain amino acid-based elemental formulas.
Title
Requires health insurance coverage for certain amino acid-based elemental formulas.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] |
Sen. Chris Brown [R] | Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] | Rep. Reed Gusciora [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2649 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-27 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-27 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-1) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Substituted for S2649 |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2016-11-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (70-0-0) |
2016-10-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A389 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-1)
A389 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-1)
A1018 (Carry Over) 2015-06-05 - Reviewed by the Pension and Health Benefits Commission Recommend to not enact
S2649 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A389
A389 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-1)
A1018 (Carry Over) 2015-06-05 - Reviewed by the Pension and Health Benefits Commission Recommend to not enact
S2649 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A389
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/A389 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/A0500/389_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A389 |